Hodd, Ralph Norman (CPSO#: 18314)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2016