Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hodes, Harold (CPSO#: 19691)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1997