Hodge, Matthew John (CPSO#: 70425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Ave E.
Owen Sound, ON N4K 6M9
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (519) 376 2121 Ext. 230
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Hodge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wiesenfeld ( CPSO# 72550 )
Dr. M. Hodge ( CPSO# 70425 )

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone Number: (416) 226-6780

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOHN HODGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998