Hodgson, David Christopher (CPSO#: 66641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7-322
7th Floor
700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-2121
Fax: (416) 946-2111
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David C. Hodgson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hodgson ( CPSO# 66641 )

Business Address:
Suite 7-322, 7th Floor
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CHRISTOPHER HODGSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2000