Hodsman, Anthony Bryan (CPSO#: 30324)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. B. Hodsman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Records St Josephs Health Center 268 Grosvenor Street London, ON N6A 4V2 Tel: 519 646 6100 x65585 Fax: 519 646 6028
Date Received: 07 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014