Hodson, David Ian (CPSO#: 43969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 67548
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Ian Hodson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hodson ( CPSO# 43969 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID IAN HODSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1989