Hoe, Walter (CPSO#: 61769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: Ho, Walter I Chie (used until: 26 Apr 2001 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walter Hoe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hoe ( CPSO# 61769 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 601-7347

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER HOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2003 to 13 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2004 to 13 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2005 to 10 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2006 to 10 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989