Hoegler, David Bradley (CPSO#: 62411)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 18 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003