Hoegler, Kathy Ann (CPSO#: 62575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew St.
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: (519) 804-9234
Fax: (519) 804-9785
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.A. Hoegler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2013

Dr. K. Hoegler ( CPSO# 62575 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KATHY ANN HOEGLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOEGLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1991