Hoenig, Julius (CPSO#: 42413)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Faculty Paediatrics, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Mar 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Nov 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 1993