Hoeschen, Lawrence Edward (CPSO#: 50780)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 1989