Hoey, John Robert (CPSO#: 63052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-5572
Fax: (844) 874-3526
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT HOEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009