Hoey, Steven Alexander (CPSO#: 62106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone: (226) 706-1501
Fax: (226) 706-1599
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Hoey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hoey ( CPSO# 62106 )

Business Address:
3 - 86 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone Number: (226) 706-1501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN ALEXANDER HOEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1992