Hofer, Stefan Oliver Paul (CPSO#: 87771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German

Education:University of Amsterdam, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Plastic Surgery
Suite 8N865
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3449
Fax: (416) 340-4403
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dryden Regional Health Centre
Division of Plastic Surgery
PO Box 3003
56 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Canada
Phone: (807) 223-8200
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stefan Hofer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hofer ( CPSO# 87771 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
8N-865
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 16 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Stefan  Oliver  Paul  Hofer may practise medicine independently in plastic
            surgery, only.