Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hoff, David Jeffrey (CPSO#: 65666)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 May 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2015