Hoffenberg, Ronald Leon (CPSO#: 21835)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2007