Hoffer, Ian Mark (CPSO#: 33342)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992