Hoffer, Mayer (CPSO#: 30856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 May 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 121
400 Walmer Road
Toronto ON  M5P 2X7
Phone: (416) 967-1890
Fax: (416) 482-8971
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 May 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 19 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., October 19, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Mayer Hoffer:

            (i)   Dr. Hoffer shall practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                  acceptable to the College in respect of patients to whom he prescribes
                  Controlled Drugs for the purpose of treating Attention Deficit Disorder
                  ("ADD") and/or Attention Deficit Hyperactivity Disorder ("ADHD") (the
                  "Clinical Supervisor").  

            (ii)  Dr. Hoffer shall engage a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                  at his own expense who shall: 

                  i.    Every two weeks, select and review twenty (20) patient charts for
                        patients with whom Dr. Hoffer has had a patient encounter in the
                        prior two-week period and for whom there is an active prescription
                        by Dr. Hoffer for one or more Controlled Drugs for the purpose of
                        treating ADD and/or ADHD;
                  
                  ii.   Meet with Dr. Hoffer at least once every two weeks to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor's review of the patient charts and to discuss
                        any concerns arising from the chart reviews; 
                  
                  iii.  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other materials or
                        conducting interviews with patients, staff or colleagues, that the
                        Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to the Clinical Supervision;
                        and
                  
                  iv.   Submit written reports to the College at least once every two
                        weeks, or immediately if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about
                        Dr. Hoffer's standard of practice or that Dr. Hoffer's patients may
                        be exposed to the risk of harm or injury.
                  
            (iii) For all patients with whom Dr. Hoffer has a patient encounter and to whom
                  he prescribes Controlled Drugs for the purpose of treating ADD and/or
                  ADHD, Dr. Hoffer shall ensure that his chart notes are available in typed
                  form within 24 hours of the patient encounter in order to facilitate the
                  review of Dr. Hoffer's care by the Clinical Supervisor;

            (iv)  Dr. Hoffer shall keep a log of all patient encounters for patients to
                  whom he prescribes Controlled Drugs for the purpose of treating ADD
                  and/or ADHD, which will include at least the following information (the
                  "Patient Log"):

                  (a)   the date of the appointment;
                  (b)   the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  (c)   the name of any Controlled Drugs currently prescribed by Dr.
                        Hoffer, indication, dose, frequency and number of tablets to be
                        dispensed. 
                  
            (v)   For all patients to whom he prescribes Controlled Drugs for the purpose
                  of treating ADD and/or ADHD, Dr. Hoffer shall keep a copy of all
                  prescriptions for Controlled Drugs and authorizations by him of refills,
                  renewals and/or part-fills of prescriptions for Controlled Drugs in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (vi)  Dr. Hoffer shall ensure that the undertaking of a Clinical Supervisor is
                  delivered to the College within fourteen (14) days of the date of the
                  Order.  If Dr. Hoffer has not delivered an undertaking signed by a
                  Clinical Supervisor to the College by this date, Dr. Hoffer shall not
                  prescribe (and shall not authorize any refills, renewals and/or
                  part-fills of prescriptions for) Controlled Drugs for the purpose of
                  treating ADD and/or ADHD and the fact of this restriction shall be a
                  term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration.

            (vii) If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking is unable or
                  unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, Dr. Hoffer shall, within
                  fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                  undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is
                  acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                  within that time.

            (viii)If Dr. Hoffer is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the terms set
                  out in section (vii) above, Dr. Hoffer shall not prescribe (and shall not
                  authorize any refills, renewals and/or part-fills of prescriptions for)
                  Controlled Drugs for the purpose of treating ADD and/or ADHD and the fact
                  of this restriction shall be a term, condition or limitation on his
                  certificate of registration.

            (ix)  Dr. Hoffer shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor to
                  the College and by the College to the Clinical Supervisor of all
                  information the Clinical Supervisor and/or the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to fulfil the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and to
                  monitor Dr. Hoffer's compliance with this Order.

            (x)   Dr. Hoffer shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order,
                  provide the College with the addresses of all locations where he
                  practices, and, if he commences practice at a new location subsequently,
                  shall provide the College with its address within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location (his "Practice Location(s)").

            (xi)  Dr. Hoffer shall cooperate with any inspection of his Practice
                  Location(s) by the College, which may be made without notice and which
                  may include but not be limited to reviews of patient charts and/or other
                  records and to interviews with patients or staff at any Practice
                  Location(s) in order to monitor his compliance with the Order. 

            (xii) Dr. Hoffer shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order,
                  provide to the College his irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"), and
                  the Drug Program Services Branch - Narcotics Monitoring System ("NMS")
                  implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, to
                  monitor his compliance with the terms of this Order.

            (xiii)Dr. Hoffer shall be responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges,
                  and expenses arising from the implementation of this Order.


            As from November 10, 2010, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mayer Hoffer, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hoffer to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


            (a)   I, DR. MAYER HOFFER, shall record height, weight, blood pressure and
                  pulse for all child and adolescent patients on an annual basis and shall
                  document same; 

            (b)   I, DR. MAYER HOFFER, shall conduct additional examinations/assessments
                  for EPS using the AIMS scale on an annual basis when it is clinically
                  indicated and shall document same;

            (c)   I, DR. MAYER HOFFER, shall discuss the side effect profiles of the
                  medication I am prescribing with patients and/or their parents and shall
                  document same; 

            (d)   In cases where medication is being used off-label, or where the dosage of
                  such medication is higher than the dose recommended by Health Canada, I,
                  DR. MAYER HOFFER, shall inform patients and/or their parents of same and
                  shall explain what 'off label' use means; and

            (e)   I, DR. MAYER HOFFER, shall require patients whom I have not seen in a
                  year to return to my office to be personally assessed prior to issuing a
                  refill of their prescriptions.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 May 2008
Summary:

On May 26, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Mayer Hoffer committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed 
to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee ordered and 
directed: 
 
1.    Dr. Hoffer to appear before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to 
      be recorded on the register. 
 
 2.   The Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Hoffer s 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      (1)   Dr. Hoffer shall successfully complete, at his own expense: 
 
            a.    the College s Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians course (attendance 
                  at the instructional portion of the course by July 31, 2008 and complete the 
                  follow-up portion by September 30, 2008); and 
            b.    the Physicians  Prescribing Skills course on or before October 16, 2008 
                  and provide proof thereof to the College; 
 
      (2)   Dr. Hoffer shall maintain a detailed prescription log during the monitoring period 
            (as defined in paragraph 3), which will be available for review by the monitor, an 
            expert in Attention Deficit Disorder, acceptable to the College (the Monitor );  
 
      (3)   Dr. Hoffer is required to undergo bi-weekly clinical monitoring at his own 
            expense by the Monitor for a period of six months or, at the discretion of the 
            Monitor, monthly clinical monitoring (instead of bi-weekly) for the second half of 
            the monitoring period.  The monitoring period shall commence no later than 30 
            days from the date of this Order; 
 
      (4)   The Monitor s review shall include the following:  
 
            a.    A review of a representative sample of Dr. Hoffer s charts;  
            b.    Discussion and review with Dr. Hoffer of his prescribing and charting; and  
            c.    A review of the prescription log (including verification of corresponding 
                  chart entries); 
 
      (5)   The Monitor will provide reports to the College after one month of monitoring, at 
            the end of the monitoring period, and at any time during the monitoring period if 
            the monitor has concerns regarding Dr. Hoffer s practice;  
 
      (6)   Dr. Hoffer shall undergo, at his own expense, a re-assessment of his practice six 
            months after the end of the monitoring period by an assessor acceptable to the 
            College (the Assessor ).  The Assessor shall report in writing to the College and 
            to Dr. Hoffer; and 
 
  
 
      (7)   Dr. Hoffer shall abide by any reasonable recommendations provided by the 
            Assessor. 
 
 3.   That Dr. Hoffer pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the 
      date of this Order. 
 
 4.   The results of this proceeding to be included on the register. 
 
Therefore, the terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration in the Province 
of Ontario issued in the name of Dr. Mayer Hoffer are effective May 26, 2008 at 12:00 noon. 
 
  
 
  
 
  
 
  
 
  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 26, 2008

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 3, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)