Hoffman, Alan George Douglas (CPSO#: 52543)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006