Hoffman, Brian Francis (CPSO#: 20826)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: North York General Hospital 555 Finch Avenue West Toronto ON M2R 1N5
Date Received: 25 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017