Hoffman, Jack (CPSO#: 17623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
134 South Seguin Estates Rd.
Seguin ON  P2A 0B2
Phone: (705) 732-2658
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK HOFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1968