Hoffman, Kerri-Lyn Elizabeth (CPSO#: 69008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Laser and Cosmetic Clinic
863 Norwest Road
Kingston ON  K7P 2N2
Phone: (613) 384-4200
Fax: (613) 384-4265
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kerri-Lyn Hoffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hoffman ( CPSO# 69008 )

Business Address:
775 Strand Bloulevard
Kingston ON  K7P 2P1

Business Address:
863 Norwest Road
Kingston ON  K7P 2N2
Phone Number: (613) 384-4200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERRI-LYN ELIZABETH HOFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2004