Hoffman, Shayna Esther (CPSO#: 86435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carelton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health and Counselling Services
Suite 2600 CCTC Building
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Canada
Phone: (613) 520-2600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Hoffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Hoffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hoffman ( CPSO# 86435 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carelton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAYNA ESTHER HOFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009