Hofley, Pamela Mary Douglas (CPSO#: 59579)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 May 2007