Hofmann, Karen Henry (CPSO#: 29939)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Hofmann, Oskar Henry (used until: 18 Feb 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016