Hogan, Jeffrey Gerard (CPSO#: 69981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 409
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone: (613) 541-3922
Fax: (613) 541-0744
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Hogan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hogan ( CPSO# 69981 )

Business Address:
797 Princess Street
Suite 409
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 541-3922

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jan 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY GERARD HOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2000