Hogarth, Margaret Taylor (CPSO#: 69442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wright State University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 183
2025 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7P 4M8
Phone: (905) 681-7755
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET TAYLOR HOGARTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOGARTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017