Hogeling, Marcia (CPSO#: 73629)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008