Hogg, David Hartwick (CPSO#: 32483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4521
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hogg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sequeira ( CPSO# 56872 )
Dr. D. Hogg ( CPSO# 32483 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Suite 5-108
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4521

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HARTWICK HOGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOGG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1981