Hogg, Donald William (CPSO#: 22846)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Hunt Club Medical Centre Suite 104 3328 McCarthy Road Ottawa, Ontario K1V 0H9 Tel: (613) 526-5515
Date Received: 16 Feb 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking, effective August 15, 2011, by Dr. Donald William Hogg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Hogg:
B1. (1) Hereby resign from the College on or before December 31, 2011.
(2) Undertake not to apply or re apply for registration as a physician in any other jurisdiction after my resignation.
(3) Agree that the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding
on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, the right to
re commence the Investigation it terminated as a result of this undertaking.
II (1) Agree that effectively immediately I will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions of any Narcotic Drugs or Preparations, Controlled Drugs, or Benzodiazepines /Other Targeted Substances.
III. (1) Agree to practice under a clinical supervisor.
IV (1) Agree that I shall post a sign in my waiting room, as follows: "Dr. Hogg has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and/or Other Targeted Substances.
C.(3) Consent to this undertaking being entered on the public register.