Hogg, William Edgar (CPSO#: 46753)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Academic Family Health Team 210 Melrose Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Y 4K7 Tel: 613 761 4334
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015