Hoirch, Adam Robert (CPSO#: 91949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202 - 66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone: (705) 476-1512
Fax: (705) 495-4500
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. R. Hoirch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hoirch ( CPSO# 91949 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
202 - 66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone Number: (705) 476-1512

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM ROBERT HOIRCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOIRCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 03 Aug 2009 to 25 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 11 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012