Hojilla, Carlo Vincent (CPSO#: 93979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Pathology and Lab Med
600 University Ave, Suite 6-400
Toronto ON  M6G1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4462
Fax: (416) 586-8628
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
Dept of Laboratory Services
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P7P3
Canada
Phone: 9054727373 Ext. 6571
Fax: 9054727133
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlo Hojilla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hojilla ( CPSO# 93979 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Pathology and Lab Med
Suite 6-400
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 1X5

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLO VINCENT HOJILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOJILLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015