Holbrook, Anne Marie (CPSO#: 52730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Mary Grace 6th Floor
Room G623 A
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35269
Fax: (905) 540-6520
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

JHCC, A3-12
Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: 905 521 5030
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Ford & Anne Holbrook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Holbrook ( CPSO# 52730 )
Dr. P. Ford ( CPSO# 55659 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Mary Grace 6th Floor
Room G623A
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Unit 204
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 948-5647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE HOLBROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLBROOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1987