Holden, Rachel Mary (CPSO#: 69896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: Pilkey, Rachel Mary (used until: 02 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3048C Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-3134
Fax: (613) 533-3292
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Holden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Holden ( CPSO# 69896 )

Business Address:
94 MacDonnell Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4B7

Business Address:
Queen's University
3048C Etherington Hall
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-3134

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL MARY HOLDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLDEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 10 Feb 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2001