Holden, Timothy Jon (CPSO#: 57915)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1987
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Mar 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2016