Holder, Douglas Allan (CPSO#: 27300)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas A. Holder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Inc., 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016