Holek, Arlene Ruriko (CPSO#: 57101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: Nishizawa, Arlene Ruriko (used until: 03 May 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
547A Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y5
Phone: (905) 574-2668
Fax: (905) 318-1115
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Holek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Holek ( CPSO# 57101 )

Business Address:
547 Upper James Street
Suite A
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y5
Phone Number: (905) 574-2668

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARLENE RURIKO HOLEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987