Holland, Alyson Vera Foskien (CPSO#: 100299)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 12 Jan 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Jun 2013 to 23 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2016 to 15 Nov 2016
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2016