Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Holland, David Christopher (CPSO#: 59376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Room 2058
Etherington Hall
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6983
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Holland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Holland ( CPSO# 59376 )

Business Address:
Queen's University Etherington Hall
Room 2058
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6983

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CHRISTOPHER HOLLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1991