Holland, Frederick John (CPSO#: 31229)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster Children's Hospital, Department of Pediatrics, 1200 Main Street West, Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 21 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015