Holland, Sharon Anne (CPSO#: 50783)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Requests for records should be forwarded to: Quinte Health Care Belleville General Hospital 265 Dundas Street East Belleville, ON K8N 5A9 Tel: (613) 969-7400
Date Received: 24 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2013