Hollett, Peter Darroch (CPSO#: 50784)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 2007