Holliday-Rhodes, Antony David (CPSO#: 28545)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Feb 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995