Hollidge, Melanie Gay (CPSO#: 77595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
Dept of Medicine - Critical Care
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines, ON L2S 0A9
St Catharines ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 9056847271 Ext. 44501
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.G. Hollidge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hollidge ( CPSO# 77595 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health Services
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Business Address:
Maui Memorial Medical Centre
221 Mahalani Street
Wailuki HI  967 3

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Hawaii

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE GAY HOLLIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLIDGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007