Hollinger, Charles Gerald (CPSO#: 33496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sleep and Alertness Clinic
Toronto ON  M5G1N8
Phone: (647) 479-2156 Ext. 202
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TRIHOSPITAL SLEEP LAB
3024 Hurontario St #208
MISSISSAUGA
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Canada
Phone: (905) 566-1010
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerald Hollinger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hollinger ( CPSO# 33496 )

Business Address:
800 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Business Address:
Suite 208
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 566-1010

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regie Cr S North York ON M3J 1Y6 Phone : 416 398 0638
Instructions: Patients seeking records from the Guelph Sleep Clinic may contact the above.
Date Received: 26 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES GERALD HOLLINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLINGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1982