Hollington, Lana Eleanor (CPSO#: 62582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 18 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 18, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lana Eleanor
            Hollington, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Hollington to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Hollington has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
            jurisdictions.