Hollingworth, Roger William (CPSO#: 50785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
509- 2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: 905 820 7877
Fax: 905 820 4887
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hollingworth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hollingworth ( CPSO# 50785 )

Business Address:
509 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-7877

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER WILLIAM HOLLINGWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLINGWORTH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1984