Holloway, Claire Maureen Barbara (CPSO#: 54295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T Wing Room 2-109
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4210
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4676
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claire M.B. Holloway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Holloway ( CPSO# 54295 )

Business Address:
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2-109
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAIRE MAUREEN BARBARA HOLLOWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLOWAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1986