Holloway, Richard Marcel (CPSO#: 50786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2253 South Koke Mill
Springfield IL  62711
United States
Phone: 217-720-2623

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD MARCEL HOLLOWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLOWAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1984